Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates Cain, Bagnall, Bartlett, Chang, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Guyton, Kerr, Lehman, Lierman, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Smith, Solomon, C. Watson, and Lafferty
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include a certain amount in the State budget to the Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education for fiscal years 2021 through 2026 to increase the number of green schools in the State; specifying the purposes for which the funds may be used; requiring that an annual evaluation of the impact of the funds be conducted in a certain manner, examine certain issues, and be provided to certain persons; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0662
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
House 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {995365/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-33) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules 58
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text - Chapter - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-117 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM