Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Data Sharing and Integration
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the duties of the Secretary of Information Technology to include the permitting of data sharing and integration among specified units of State government; establishing the Management Intelligence Incentive Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Governor to submit with the State budget specified information about the Fund and projects supported by the Fund; authorizing specified State units to request specified project funding from the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
(   3A-303 through 3A-305, 3A-310, 3A-310 through 3A-313, 6-226 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page