Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene) and Delegates Bromwell, Kipke, Hayes, Reznik, Wilkins, Morhaim, Platt, Malone, Pena-Melnyk, B. Wilson, Folden, Pendergrass, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring health care providers to prescribe the lowest effective dose of an opioid and in a quantity no greater than the quantity needed for the expected duration of specified pain unless the opioid is prescribed to treat a specified disorder or specified pain; requiring the dosage, quantity, and duration of specified prescribed opioids to be based on an evidence-based clinical guideline for prescribing controlled dangerous substances; authorizing specified disciplinary action by health occupations boards; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {526580/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {526580/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 60
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Text - Chapter - Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-223, 14-404, 16-311, 4-315, 8-316 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:33 AM