Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the exclusion of taxicab service from the definition of "transit service"; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777679/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2016 10/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {777679/1 Adopted 12
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 16
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM