Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Government - Websites - Language Access
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each State department, agency, and program to provide equal access versions of certain websites in certain languages except under certain circumstances; repealing a certain provision of law providing that the reasonable steps certain departments, agencies, and programs are required to take related to equal access to public services for individuals with limited English proficiency include the operation and maintenance of certain equal access versions of certain websites; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2017 10/03/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Websites - Language Access
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - State Government - Websites - Language Access
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (119-17) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Text - Chapter - State Government - Websites - Language Access
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1102, 10-1103, 10-1104, 10-1105 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:15 PM