Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Tax Credit for Wineries and Vineyards
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified qualified expenditures at specified wineries and specified vineyards in the State; requiring the Maryland Department of Agriculture to administer the tax credit; providing for the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued by the Department each year; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; applying the tax credit to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; defining terms; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0757 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 9/04/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2013 1/10/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM