Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers to impose a civil penalty not exceeding $5,000 against a person who violates specified provisions of law; requiring the Board to consider specified factors to determine the amount of the penalty; and requiring the Board to pay penalties collected under the Act to the General Fund of the State.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/15/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2014 1/21/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 10
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 14
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM