Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending for a certain number of years the length of time a county may retain certain revenue from the agricultural land transfer tax for use in certain agricultural land preservation programs; requiring the Department of Planning and the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, in accordance with certain provisions of law, to review any update to a county's comprehensive plan or any other change that may affect a priority preservation area; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 19AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 19AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
(   2-504.1, 2-514, 2-516, 2-518 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page