Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control Purposes
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Budget and Management)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Central Collection Unit in the Department of Budget and Management to manage the monitoring and recording of specified incoming telephone calls for training and quality control purposes; prohibiting the Central Collection Unit from recording or monitoring calls to or from a direct individual line of an employee of the Unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759738/1
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/04/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {759738/1 29
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 29
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {759738/1 Report Adopted 30
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Appropriations 35
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM