Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Assurance
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Comptroller)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Comptroller of the State to manage the monitoring and recording of specified incoming telephone calls to employees of the Comptroller's call center for training and quality assurance purposes; prohibiting the Comptroller from recording or monitoring calls to or from direct individual lines in the Office of the Comptroller; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/11/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM