Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and Penalties
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Comptroller)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the exemptions from the tobacco tax for cigarettes and other tobacco products brought into the State by specified consumers; establishing mandatory fines for first and subsequent violations; and altering the penalties for first and subsequent violations for a person who willfully ships, imports, sells into or within, or transports within the State cigarettes or other tobacco products on which the tobacco tax has not been paid.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/16/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379736/1
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379736/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {363229/2 Rejected (6-39)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/16/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {379736/1 22
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted 22
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {379736/1 Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {363229/2 Rejected (6-39) 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 25
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters 28
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 4/06/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104, 13-1015 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM