Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016)
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to cancel the commercial driver's license of an individual who fails to submit to the Administration a current certificate of physical examination; authorizing the Administration to immediately reinstate and, subject to specified conditions, issue a noncommercial driver's license of an appropriate class to an individual whose commercial driver's license is canceled as a result of the failure to submit a certificate of physical examination, under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 10
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 13
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {410414/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 57
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-812 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM