Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Insurance Administration, Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an insurance producer, when soliciting or advertising the sale of a Medicare Advantage Plan, Medicare Advantage Prescription Drug Plan, Medicare Prescription Drug Plan (Part D), or Medicare Section 1876 cost plan, to comply with the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services' Medicare Marketing Guidelines, including the prohibitions against specified activities.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/18/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/18/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 8
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Second Reading Passed 8
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 9
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 11
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 58
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-224 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM