Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting a transfer of real property from a sole proprietorship to a limited liability company from recordation and transfer taxes if the sole member of the limited liability company is identical to the converting sole proprietor and specified other conditions are met; providing that the transfer of a controlling interest in a specified company is subject to specified taxes under specified circumstances; defining "sole proprietorship" to include an individual who owns an interest in real property in the individual's name; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0363
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0044 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679137/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {679137/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Ways and Means 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text - Chapter - Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
(   12-108, 12-117, 13-103, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page