Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property used for the purposes of a public school robotics program or nonprofit robotics program in the State; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0160
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0179 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Favorable Adopted 22
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Second Reading Passed 22
Text - Third - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 24
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Referred Ways and Means 26
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM