Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays - Membership From Ocean City
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias (Chair, Joint Committee on the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Areas)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor of Ocean City to appoint a designee of the Mayor as a member of the Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays; and establishing that a member from the Atlantic Coastal Bays Watershed who is the Mayor of Ocean City or the designee of the Mayor is not subject to the advice and consent of the Senate.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {800613/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 23
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {800613/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Passed Enrolled 57
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1803, 8-1804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM