Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising, restating, and recodifying the laws of this State relating to sheriffs' salaries and expenses; clarifying language; making certain technical and stylistic changes; providing for the construction of the Act; providing for the effect and construction of certain provisions of the Act; and authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code to make certain corrections in a certain manner.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judiciary 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text - Chapter - Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
(   2-301, 2-309, 2-310, 2-311, 2-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page