Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Sponsored by
Senators Carter and Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 6 months to 1 year the minimum criminal sentence or potential sentence that disqualifies an individual from jury service.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0073
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-43)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Judiciary 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-43) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Text - Chapter - Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page