Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Benson, Colburn, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Ferguson, Forehand, Garagiola, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Miller, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, Stone, Young, Conway, Rosapepe, Jennings, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified licensing units and boards to give credit to former service members for relevant military training, education, and experience in connection with the issuance of occupational and professional licenses, certificates, and registrations; repealing and recodifying provisions of law regarding the renewal of occupational or professional licenses and the completion of continuing education or continuing competency requirements for specified members of an armed force deployed outside the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0225
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414137/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/17/2013
Legislative Date
4/17/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {414137/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters 52
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/17/2013 4/17/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2.5-101 through 2.5-108, 2-111 )
(   10-101, 13-501, 13-516, 15-113, 6-101.1 )
(   1-701 through 1-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM