Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) Program
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Klausmeier, Kasemeyer, Miller, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Forehand, Garagiola, Glassman, King, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Robey, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) Program (Maryland EARN Program) in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Department of Business and Economic Development and the Governor's Workforce Investment Board, to establish and administer the Program to provide grants on a competitive basis for specified purposes; providing that specified intellectual property developed as a result of grants awarded remain in the public domain; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0227
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-23)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {547472/1 Report Adopted 25
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 30
House 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 43
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Second Reading Passed 43
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (115-23) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Returned Passed 44
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-701 through 11-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM