Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting specified errors and omissions in the Annotated Code and specified uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting specified obsolete references; reorganizing specified sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying specified corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; providing for the correction of specified errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 10:45 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/22/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 10:45 a.m.
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 17
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 17
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 18
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 21
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Returned Passed 41
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 6-201, 7-101, 8-216, 9-217 )
(   5-207 )
(   13-201, 17-405, 17-410 )
(   12-301, 16.5-216, 16-222 )
(   10-119, 3-304, 3-306, 3-907, 5-621 )
(   11-202, 11-203, 18-1502, 4-115 )
(   13-243 )
(   14-508, 5-203.1, 9-1605.2, 9-206 )
(   14-305, 14-307, 5-321, 5-339, 5-3B-12, 5-3B-32 )
(   18-1001, 18-901, 19-1801, 20-111, 21-2A-01 )
(   12-407, 14-5B-05, 8-6A-05, 9-314.2 )
(   31-103, 31-113 )
(   1-501, 1-507, 1-509, 18-207, 5-104 )
(   4-1017, 4-11B-01 )
(   11-125 )
(   12-111, 12-301, 5A-303, 6-222 )
(   10-617, 9-1A-06 )
(   1-305, 2-202, 4-105 )
(   12-117, 7-208 )
(   11-127.2, 16-122, 16-205.1, 24-111.3, 26-404, 8-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM