Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Getty, Jennings, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing procedures for the election and appointment of the members of the Baltimore County Board of Education; repealing provisions governing the appointment of members of the county board; establishing the composition of the county board; requiring members of the county board to reside in, be a registered voter in, and be elected from specified districts; establishing the Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission; requiring the Governor to make specified appointments; establishing specified compensation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0384
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0010 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644436/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {553728/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625260/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
65B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65B
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {644436/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {553728/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/19/2014 3/16/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 52
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {625260/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Barnes) Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 70
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 65B
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65B
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Passed Enrolled 65B
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-109, 3-114, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM