Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Stationary Engineers in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2024, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring that a preliminary evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be conducted on or before December 15, 2021.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0253
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 18
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 20
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 23
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM