Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Delaying the effective date of the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act until July 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517171/1
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 (Finance Committee)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517171/1
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted (28-16)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted (28-15)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Enforcement - Delayed Implementation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 19
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Manno) Adopted 19
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 (Finance Committee) 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted 20
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 21
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted (28-16) 21
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted (28-15) 21
Text - Third - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 23
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM