Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a unit of prosecution for a continuing course of unlawful sexual conduct with a victim under the age of 14 years includes three acts that would constitute certain criminal violations over a period of 90 days or more; and establishing that violations that occur in different periods of time are separate violations.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {128172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {128172/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judiciary 38
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM