Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties
Sponsored by
Senator Peters (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Budget and Management, the State Comptroller, and the State Treasurer to each appoint their respective deputies to serve as designees on the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and altering a specified defined term to provide for specified fiduciary duties of members of specified committees established by the Board.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564365/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Appropriations 38
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {564365/2 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Passed Enrolled 57
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM