Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of Cancer
Sponsored by
Senators Muse, Colburn, Conway, Dyson, Ferguson, Jacobs, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Peters, Pugh, Raskin, Simonaire, Stone, Young, Zirkin, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Department of the Environment, to convene a workgroup to examine issues relating to the investigation of potential cancer clusters in the State and potential environmental causes of cancer; requiring the workgroup to include specified legislators and representatives; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report findings and recommendations of the workgroup to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1343
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0784 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {567379/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {206686/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {567379/1 Report Adopted 25
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 30
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {206686/1 Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM