Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Augustine, Benson, Ferguson, Hayes, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Smith, and Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a termination provision for certain provisions of law relating to policy and reporting requirements for race-based traffic stops; requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, by September 1 each year, to post on its website in a certain location a filterable data display showing traffic stop data collected for the previous calendar year that allows a person to filter the traffic stop data by county, municipality, or law enforcement agency and to review certain visuals; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0301
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Ethnicity-Based or Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {418273/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {760113/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 63
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West) 62A
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {673727/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {673727/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-113 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:36 AM