Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsored by
Charles County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Charles County to use the proceeds from the issuance of certain tax increment financing bonds for convention centers, conference centers, or visitor's centers, to maintain infrastructure improvements at the centers, and to market development districts facilities and other improvements in the Waldorf Urban Redevelopment Corridor; and authorizing Charles County to establish a special taxing district, impose ad valorem or special taxes, and issue bonds to provide financing, refinancing, or reimbursement for certain costs.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0345
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {169439/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {955360/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {169439/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {955360/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted (131-0) 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 49A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:28 AM