Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Ordinary Disability Retirees - Earnings Limitation
Sponsored by
Senator Peters (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from a specified reemployment earnings limitation specified retirees whose average final compensation was less than $25,000 and who are reemployed while receiving an ordinary disability retirement allowance from the State Retirement and Pension System.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0581
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {279532/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {279532/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Appropriations 38
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM