Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 8
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting certain errors or omissions in certain articles of the Annotated Code and in certain uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting certain obsolete references; reorganizing certain sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying certain corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; providing for the correction of certain errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 8
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 8
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
(   12-905, 21-1304.1, 21-1304.2, 22-909, 25-1401, 5-101 )
(   10-101, 12-101, 15-316, 17-403, 17-534, 17-536, 17-613, 2-403, 2-4A-01, 6-316 )
(   15-207, 2-103.1 )
(   3-1503, 3-8A-19.1, 4-202, 4-301, 5-106 )
(   5-404, 5-622 )
(   11-117, 11-607, 11-811, 1-203.1, 16-201, 2-105 )
(   10-205, 11-105, 11-601, 12-104.1, 12-107, 13-303, 13-304, 15-106.6, 16-314.1, 16-610, 18-1916, 18-2601, 18-2806, 18-3402, 18-3506, 18-803, 2-104, 23-102, 23-604, 24-1003, 3-1002, 3-901, 4-126, 4-302, 5-102, 5-202, 5-216, 6-117.1, 6-306, 6-701, 7-1503, 7-1512, 7-203.2, 7-303, 7-505, 7-702, 8-417, 9.5-505 )
(   13-306, 13-307, 13-505 )
(   6-819, 9-1605.2, 9-1605.3 )
(   4-501 )
(   11-201, 2-104.1 )
(   10-622, 13-3804, 13-3805, 19-705.1, 24-1503 )
(   1-901, 7-101 )
(   10-401 )
(   15-1202, 15-124, 15-142, 19-807, 20-612, 6-122 )
(   3-103, 3-122, 3-210, 3-305, 3-604, 3-909, 4-1033, 4-217, 4-513, 4-701, 4-714, 4-745, 4-901, 5-1203, 5-1208, 5-1504, 5-1601, 5-214, 5-9A-02 )
(   12-812, 13-502, 2-311, 3-201, 3-312, 3-506, 4-1102, 4-801, 5-601 )
(   6-207, 7-207, 7-208 )
(   13-103, 13-110, 13-112, 13-224, 14-302, 17-702, 4-809, 5-814, 5A-303, 8-112 )
(   10-1503, 20-301, 9-112, 9-1A-26 )
(   10-204, 10-205 )
(   13-919, 16-205.1, 16-402, 21-104, 21-1205.1, 21-1415, 21-301, 21-704, 21-801.1, 21-803, 21-805, 21-809, 21-902, 22-224.1, 22-225, 22-302, 24-102, 4-101, 4-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page