Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Getty, Gladden, Glassman, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Miller, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program; authorizing specified educational institutions meeting specified criteria to apply to the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to be designated as a qualified institution; requiring the Secretary to approve or reject an application for designation as a qualified institution within 90 days after the application is submitted; requiring county and municipal corporations to provide specified property tax credits to specified entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0742
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {799634/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {603427/2 Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {405666/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM