Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund Expenditures
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Getty, Gladden, Glassman, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to include on specified tax forms a demonstrative representation of how much of each dollar that the General Fund receives is spent on specified categories; providing that the representation may be in graphical or pictorial form; requiring the Comptroller to post the representation on the Comptroller's Web site and to include it in specified instructions on the Web site; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {289138/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 47
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM