Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas Facility
Sponsored by
Senators Miller and Dyson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Calvert County to enter into a payment in lieu of taxes agreement with the owner of a facility for the liquefaction of natural gas; requiring an agreement for payment in lieu of taxes to include specified provisions; providing that specified property of the owner of a natural gas facility is exempt from county property tax as provided in a payment in lieu of taxes agreement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0822
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {223220/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {223220/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 48A
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-517, 9-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM