Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Forehand, King, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing specified employees a total of 6 workweeks of unpaid parental leave in a 12-month period under specified circumstances; authorizing an employer to deny unpaid parental leave to an eligible employee under specified circumstances; authorizing an employer to require an eligible employee, or authorizing an eligible employee to elect, to substitute paid leave for any part of or all of the period of parental leave; requiring employers to maintain health coverage during the duration of parental leave; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1026
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957773/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283397/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-37)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senators Pugh, Feldman, and Glassman
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Delegates Vaughn, Olszewski, and Aumann
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {957773/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {283397/1 Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-37) 61
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senators Pugh, Feldman, and Glassman 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Refuses to Recede 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Delegates Vaughn, Olszewski, and Aumann 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103, 3-1201 through 3-1211 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:40 PM