Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Education - Summer Career Academy Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Colburn, Ferguson, King, Manno, Miller, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Summer Career Academy Pilot Program and identifying the purpose of the Program; requiring the State Department of Education to develop criteria for the selection of eligible school systems and eligible students for participation in the Program; authorizing the State Superintendent of Schools to select up to four school systems to participate in the Program; requiring a student selected to participate in the Program to be assigned a summer career counselor and to receive a stipend of up to $4,500; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {254234/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 46
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {225367/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM