Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Feldman, Guzzone, Madaleno, McFadden, Miller, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Young, and Zucker
Status
Veto sustained (0-45)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Education Development Collaborative to advise and make recommendations to the Board of Education, the General Assembly, and local school systems regarding policies necessary to promote 21st century learning that enhances socioeconomic and demographic diversity across the State's public schools and reduces the specified achievement gap; requiring the Collaborative to report annually to the Governor, the State Department of Education, and the General Assembly on or before October 1; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-45)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {179931/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {445062/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {143322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 2/02/2017 Veto sustained (0-45)
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/21/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {179931/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {445062/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {143322/1 Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-101 through 9.5-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM