Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices - Use of First-Class Mail Tracking Methods
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which insurers are required to notify specified persons of the rescission, cancellation, nonrenewal, or termination of policies or binders of specified property or casualty insurance, of the offer of specified coverage for water damage, of specified information about flood insurance, of specified optional coverages, of specified notices concerning portable electronics insurance, or of an increase in the total premium for a policy of private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1462
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373691/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {373691/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 12-106, 19-202, 19-206, 19-207, 19-903, 27-601.2, 27-602, 27-603, 27-613, 27-614 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM