Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a law enforcement officer who receives probation before judgment for certain charges is not entitled to a hearing under the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights; providing for the selection and composition of a hearing board in Baltimore City; excluding Baltimore City from a certain provision allowing for an alternative method for forming a hearing board under the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights when the alternative method has been agreed to under certain collective bargaining agreements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1740
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0545 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-107, 3-108 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:18 PM