Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools - Law Enforcement Presence (School Safety Act 2018: Deterrence)
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Miller, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to have an armed school resource officer present on school grounds during regular school hours on school days; requiring the Department of State Police to assign a State Police officer to a certain public school under certain circumstances; authorizing a private school to have an armed school resource officer on school grounds; requiring a local law enforcement agency to collaborate with a local public school to establish a reasonable time for responding to an emergency at the public school; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Senate Rules 45
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Schools - Law Enforcement Presence (School Safety Act 2018: Deterrence)
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM