SB0237 (CH0211)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/21/20131/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/14/20132/14/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/20132/15/2013Favorable Report Adopted26
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {593326/1 Adopted26
Second Reading Passed with Amendments26
2/19/20132/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)28
House2/20/20132/20/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations31
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (140-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.