SB0906

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Construction of a Highway or County Road - Commercial Property - Access Roads

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Finance
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments {217871/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 22, 2018 11:47 A.M.