HB0039 (CH0247)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/8/201510/8/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Ways and Means
1/7/20161/7/2016Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
1/18/20161/18/2016Hearing cancelled
1/19/20161/19/2016Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
3/19/20163/19/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/19/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments {995161/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (134-1)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments {464139/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3)65
House4/11/20164/7/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (138-1)70
Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2016 12:48 P.M.