HB0167 (CH0352)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation Day

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ivey

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.