HB0198 (CH0389)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session



Income Tax - Earned Income Credit - Refundable Amount

Sponsored by:

Delegate Mitchell


Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/16/20141/16/2014First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20143/5/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Favorable with Amendments {745264/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/7/20143/7/2014Third Reading Passed (134-0)43
Senate3/10/20143/7/2014First Reading Budget and Taxation41A
3/12/20143/12/2014Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20143/18/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
4/4/20144/4/2014Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20143/26/2014Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20143/28/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
House4/7/20144/1/2014Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

May 5, 2014 2:26 P.M.