HB0300

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fennell

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20161/26/2016First Reading Ways and Means
1/27/20161/27/2016Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20162/22/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20162/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {675963/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/25/20162/25/2016Third Reading Passed (136-3)32
Senate2/26/20162/26/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation32
3/9/20163/9/2016Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.