HB0362

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs

Sponsored by:

Delegate Waldstreicher

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20152/5/2015First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20152/6/2015Hearing cancelled
2/13/20152/13/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20152/25/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
3/18/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/18/20153/15/2015Favorable with Amendments {712812/1 Report Adopted45A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45A
3/19/20153/16/2015Third Reading Passed (138-0)46
Senate3/20/20153/20/2015First Reading Judicial Proceedings47
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20153/28/2015Favorable with Amendments {948173/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
4/3/20153/29/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)56
House4/13/20154/9/2015House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments70
House Requests Senate Recede70
Conference Committee Appointed70
Delegates Vallario, Rosenberg, and Anderson70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 20, 2015 7:17 P.M.