HB0428

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Judiciary
1/27/20171/27/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {902110/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/9/20173/9/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)42
Senate3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {138476/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)60
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments68
House Requests Senate Recede68
Conference Committee Appointed68
Delegates Moon, Vallario, and B. Wilson68
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Refuses to Recede63A
Conference Committee Appointed63A
Senators Smith, Zirkin, and Hough63A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 10:44 P.M.