HB0449 (CH0481)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20152/9/2015First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/13/20152/13/2015Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/23/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {110711/1 Report Adopted50
Special Order until later today (Delegate Beitzel) Adopted 50
3/23/20153/21/2015Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {183028/2 Rejected (47-93)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {593620/1 Rejected (49-88)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {903121/1 Rejected (47-93)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate McKay) {303425/1 Rejected (43-95)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {303124/1 Rejected (47-92)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {363920/1 Rejected (50-88)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {673227/1 Rejected (41-93)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {653624/1 Rejected (52-84)51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/24/20153/22/2015Third Reading Passed (93-45)52
Senate3/25/20153/22/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs49
3/26/20153/26/2015Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20153/30/2015Favorable with Amendments {214533/1 Report Adopted57
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {463528/1 Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/7/20153/31/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)58
House4/10/20154/4/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (103-33)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/30/20155/30/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 20, 2015 7:18 P.M.