HB0515

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rosenberg

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {115265/1 Report Adopted45
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 45
3/18/20133/15/2013Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 48A
3/19/20133/16/2013Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 49
3/20/20133/17/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {903520/1 Adopted50
Floor Committee Amendment {745769/1 Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (118-19)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:05 P.M.